Global Patent Index - EP 1030968 A1

EP 1030968 A1 2000-08-30 - FUEL INJECTOR

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTOR

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1030968 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99957083 A

Priority

  • DE 9901075 W
  • DE 19827136 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827136A1] The invention relates to a fuel injector for fuel injection systems of internal combustion engines, comprising two pre-assembled independent modules, namely a functional part (30) which essentially comprises an electromagnetic circuit (1, 2, 5) and a sealing valve (15, 19), and a connecting part (40) which consists primarily of a hydraulic connector (43, 44) and an electrical connector (56, 57). In the fully assembled injector electrical connecting elements (34, 59) and hydraulic connecting elements (28, 43) of the two modules (30, 40) cooperate such as to ensure a reliable electrical and hydraulic connection. The valve is configured as a side-feed injector and the electrical connector (56, 57) is further away from the functional part (30) than the hydraulic connector (43, 44) of the connecting part (40).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06; F02M 51/00; F02M 61/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/08 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 51/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/0682 (2013.01); F02M 51/005 (2013.01); F02M 51/0664 (2013.01); F02M 51/0667 (2013.01); F02M 61/145 (2013.01); F02M 61/168 (2013.01); Y10S 239/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966195A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827136 A1 19991223; EP 1030968 A1 20000830; EP 1030968 B1 20031105; JP 2002518631 A 20020625; JP 4335450 B2 20090930; US 6257509 B1 20010710; WO 9966195 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907621

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907621

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130627

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110412

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-04-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050412

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040319

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907621 P 20031211

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020919

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT