Global Patent Index - EP 1030998 B1

EP 1030998 B1 2007-10-24 - MOTOR VEHICLE HEADLIGHT EQUIPPED WITH A LAMP AND IMPROVED ELECTROMAGNETIC SHIELDING MEANS

Title (en)

MOTOR VEHICLE HEADLIGHT EQUIPPED WITH A LAMP AND IMPROVED ELECTROMAGNETIC SHIELDING MEANS

Title (de)

KRAFTFAHRZEUGSCHEINWERFER MIT EINER LAMPE UND EINER VERBESSERTEN, ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN ABSCHIRMUNG

Title (fr)

PROJECTEUR DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE EQUIPE D'UNE LAMPE ET DE MOYENS PERFECTIONNES DE BLINDAGE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 1030998 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99940233 A

Priority

  • FR 9902039 W
  • FR 9811837 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2783593A1] Light from a discharge lamp (20) is directed through a semiconvex lens (40) by an elliptical mirror (10) which is made from pressed metal and is electrically conducting. The surface of the lamp carrier (50) is connected to the mirror and also has elastic tongues or claws (51) which press against the conducting metal envelope of the high voltage electrical connector (60)

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 25/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 15/00 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2006.01); F21W 101/10 (2006.01); F21Y 101/00 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1109 (2013.01); F21S 48/1186 (2013.01); F21V 25/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2783593 A1 20000324; FR 2783593 B1 20001229; DE 69937391 D1 20071206; DE 69937391 T2 20080724; EP 1030998 A1 20000830; EP 1030998 B1 20071024; ES 2296400 T3 20080416; JP 2002525815 A 20020813; JP 4530316 B2 20100825; US 6390657 B1 20020521; WO 0017570 A1 20000330

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160818

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160817

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071024

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-05-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2008-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2296400 T3

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69937391 P 20071206

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 25/00 20060101AFI20070426BHEP

2007-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21S 8/10 20060101ALI20070426BHEP

2007-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 19/00 20060101ALI20070426BHEP

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060117

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE