Global Patent Index - EP 1030999 B1

EP 1030999 B1 2002-12-18 - COMBUSTION FURNACE PARTICULARLY FOR WASTES

Title (en)

COMBUSTION FURNACE PARTICULARLY FOR WASTES

Title (de)

MÜLLVERBRENNUNGSOFEN

Title (fr)

FOURNEAU DE COMBUSTION, EN PARTICULIER POUR DECHETS

Publication

EP 1030999 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98955894 A

Priority

  • IT 9800311 W
  • IT UD970212 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9926022A1] A combustion furnace particularly for wastes, of the type provided with a structure for the advancement of waste material (1-12) in the combustion chamber (2), having a floor with stair-down sectors (21, 22, 23, 24, 25) overlapped by retractable advancement elements (32, 33, 34) with a to-and-fro reciprocating movement (3) having a pusher function for advancing the combustion material towards a downstream area for the ashes discharge (25), characterised in that, just at the material entry and under it, in the respective combustion chamber, an air-jet area (51) able to separate the dust to be burnt with respect to the biggest sized dust is provided, throwing it in the air of the combustion chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 5/00; F23G 5/16; F23G 5/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/00 (2006.01); F23G 5/16 (2006.01); F23G 5/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/16 (2013.01); F23G 5/002 (2013.01); F23G 5/46 (2013.01); F23G 2203/803 (2013.01); F23G 2209/261 (2013.01); F23G 2209/28 (2013.01); F23G 2900/50008 (2013.01); F23H 2900/03021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9926022 A1 19990527; AT 230091 T 20030115; AU 1258099 A 19990607; DE 69810348 D1 20030130; DE 69810348 T2 20031106; EP 1030999 A1 20000830; EP 1030999 B1 20021218; ES 2190118 T3 20030716; IT 1296716 B1 19990715; IT UD970212 A1 19990513

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121110

2014-03-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140305

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69810348

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-06-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120131

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111214

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20111130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-12-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GEM-MATTHEWS INTERNATIONAL S.R.L., IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: G.E.M. S.R.L., UDINE, IT

- Document: DE 69810348

- Effective date: 20111011

2011-12-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GEM-MATTHEWS INTERNATIONAL S.R.L., IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GEM SOLUZIONI AMBIENTALI S.R.L., UDINE, IT

- Document: DE 69810348

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69810348

- Representative's name: MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69810348

- Representative's name: MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20111011

2011-11-23 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GEM- MATTHEWS INTERNATIONAL S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20111111

2011-11-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GEM-MATTHEWS INTERNATIONAL S.R.L., IT

- Effective date: 20111014

2011-10-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69810348

- Representative's name: MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & PARTNER GBR, DE

2011-10-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69810348

- Representative's name: MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & PARTNER GBR, DE

2011-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GEM-MATTHEWS INTERNATIONAL S.R.L.

- Free text: G.E.M. S.R.L.#VIA BELLONI, 9#33100 UDINE (IT) -TRANSFER TO- GEM-MATTHEWS INTERNATIONAL S.R.L.#VIA ANTONIO ZANUSSI#33100 UDINE (IT)

2004-08-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031109

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-11-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031109

2003-11-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031109

2003-08-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190118 T3

2003-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO DIPL.-ING. S. V. KULHAVY + CO.

2003-03-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-03-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-03-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810348 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810348 P 20030130

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230091 T 20030115

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011206

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE