Global patent index - EP 1031000 A1

EP 1031000 A1 2000-08-30 - FUEL COMBUSTION METHOD AND REACTOR

Title (en)

FUEL COMBUSTION METHOD AND REACTOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND REAKTOR ZUR VERBRENNUNG VON BRENNSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET REACTEUR POUR LA COMBUSTION DE COMBUSTIBLES

Publication

EP 1031000 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98959868 A

Priority

  • DE 19749688 A
  • EP 9807175 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19749688A1] The invention relates to a method for combustion of fuels of any specific state of aggregation which are burnt with air and water is possibly added. The invention also relates to a reactor for said method, designed to optimise the combustion process. Solid, liquid and/or gaseous fuel, possibly water and/or an oxidizing agent are conducted by means of compressed air into a reaction chamber (2) in an axial direction, whereby the amount of compressed air thus injected corresponds to the amount of air required for full combustion and the mixture introduced by means of a nozzle is conducted to a deflecting surface(7) in the inner area of the reaction chamber (2), whereupon it is atomized, sublimated and/or vaporized and burnt in an explosive manner before it can reach the wall or the bottom of the reaction chamber (2). The reactor (1) for this combustion method has a hyperbolic reactor head (3) which is connected to the outlet opening (4) of the reaction chamber (2) and which extends therefrom with an expanded cross-section, giving the reactor (1) a nozzle shape.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23L 7/00; F23C 3/00; F23C 11/00; F23G 7/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/24 (2006.01); F23C 99/00 (2006.01); F23G 7/05 (2006.01); F23L 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 99/00 (2013.01); F23G 7/05 (2013.01); F23L 7/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924756A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19749688 A1 19990512; AT 204974 T 20010915; AU 1561499 A 19990531; AU 734573 B2 20010614; AU 734573 C 20011129; CA 2309650 A1 19990520; CA 2309650 C 20060131; CN 1153925 C 20040616; CN 1281544 A 20010124; DK 1031000 T3 20011227; EP 1031000 A1 20000830; EP 1031000 B1 20010829; ES 2163304 T3 20020116; HK 1030448 A1 20020111; JP 2001522979 A 20011120; JP 3509753 B2 20040322; NO 20002364 A 20000505; NO 20002364 D0 20000505; NO 318705 B1 20050425; PL 193419 B1 20070228; PL 340823 A1 20010226; PT 1031000 E 20020228; RU 2198349 C2 20030210; US 6575733 B1 20030610; WO 9924756 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status

2016-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-08-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151110

2016-03-11 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20160205

2016-03-11 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BRAMBLE TRADING INTERNACIONAL S.R.L., PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20160205

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BRAMBLE TRADING INTERNACIONAL S.R.L., IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59801352

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-12-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59801352

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KUDLEK & GRUNERT PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BRAMBLE TRADING INTERNACIONAL S.R.L., IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-12-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-10-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2004-10-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BRAMBLE-TRADING INTERNACIONAL LDA

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2004-08-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-07-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BRAMBLE - TRADING INTERNACIONAL LDA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2003-09-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2003-08-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-07-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2003-06-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030609

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GOURMELI INTERNATIONAL N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2002-12-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-11-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021110

2002-10-09 [REG GB 713F] APPLICATION FOR MENTION OF INVENTOR (SECT. 13(1)/1977) ALLOWED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 713F

2002-08-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-12 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Free Format Text: STAFFLER, FRANZ, JOSEF * BRANZI, VINCENZO

2002-03-29 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20010402280

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20011128

2002-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2163304

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-01-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011203

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011220

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2001-12-14 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011214

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-11-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011129

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-11-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011128

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-11-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011127

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-11-26 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011126

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-11-07 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011107

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801352

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-04

2001-10-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2001-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 204974

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE