Global Patent Index - EP 1031006 A1

EP 1031006 A1 2000-08-30 - BOUNDARY LIGHT CARTRIDGE AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR

Title (en)

BOUNDARY LIGHT CARTRIDGE AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR

Title (de)

RANDFEUERPATRONE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

CARTOUCHE POUR LE BALISAGE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1031006 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963416 A

Priority

  • DE 19749737 A
  • EP 9807084 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19749737A1] The invention relates to a boundary light cartridge and a method for producing the same having a cartridge case (2) with a fitted projectile, a propelling charge powder arranged inside the cartridge case (2), and an ignition assembly for the propelling charge power, whereby the cartridge case (2) has a circumferential radial indentation (10) on the base (3) thereof in which the ignition assembly is arranged. In ignition assemblies which lack harmful substances, the invention provides that the base (3) of the cartridge case is pressed inward at least in partial areas in order to guarantee a complete and uniform reaction during short ignition times of an ignition assembly. As a result, the opening (13) of the indentation (10) is reduced in size toward the interior of the cartridge case (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 5/32; B21D 51/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/54 (2006.01); F42B 5/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 5/32 (2013.01); B21D 51/54 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9924779A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19749737 A1 19990512; AU 1871199 A 19990531; AU 749127 B2 20020620; EP 1031006 A1 20000830; EP 1031006 B1 20021113; US 6352033 B1 20020305; WO 9924779 A1 19990520; ZA 9810313 B 19990518

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-02-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806296 20021219

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI GB IT LI SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI GB IT LI SE