Global Patent Index - EP 1031079 A2

EP 1031079 A2 2000-08-30 - METHOD OF SEQUENCING COMPUTER CONTROLLED TASKS BASED ON THE RELATIVE SPATIAL LOCATION OF TASK OBJECTS IN A DIRECTIONAL FIELD

Title (en)

METHOD OF SEQUENCING COMPUTER CONTROLLED TASKS BASED ON THE RELATIVE SPATIAL LOCATION OF TASK OBJECTS IN A DIRECTIONAL FIELD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SEQUENZIEREN VON RECHNERGESTEUERTEN AUFGABEN AUF BASIS DER RELATIVEN ORTUNG VON AUFGABEOBJEKTEN IN EINEM RICHTUNGSABHÄNGIGEN FELD

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SEQUENCEMENT DE TACHES INFORMATISEES EN FONCTION DE LA REPARTITION SPATIALE DES DIFFERENTS OBJETS DE TACHES DANS UN CHAMP ORIENTE

Publication

EP 1031079 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98913211 A

Priority

  • US 9806086 W
  • US 4337197 P
  • US 90570197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845767A2] A graphical method for sequencing computer control task uses objects to represent the task to be performed by the computer. The objects are placed in a directional field having a directional attribute which specifies how the tasks are to be sequenced. The sequence of tasks to be performed collectively defines a procedure. When the procedure is initiated, the computer automatically sequences the task within the procedure based on the relative special location of the task objects and the directional attribute. The sequence can be modified by changing the relative location of the task objects or by changing the directional attribute.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/44 (2006.01); G06F 9/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/4881 (2013.01); G06F 8/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845767 A2 19981015; WO 9845767 A3 19990107; CN 1266510 A 20000913; EP 1031079 A2 20000830; EP 1031079 A4 20040915

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080917

2007-04-25 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060502

2005-05-04 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20050318

2004-10-20 [DA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2004-09-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040802

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991028

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI