Global patent index - EP 1031102 A2

EP 1031102 A2 2000-08-30 - EN

Title (en)

EN

Title (de)

VIRTUELLE PERSONEN ZUR HILFE BEI DER NUTZUNG VON GERÄTEN UND KOMMUNIKATIVEN NETZEN UND INBESONDERE BEI DER AUSGABE VON INDIVIDUELL NUTZBAREN KARTEN

Title (fr)

PERSONNES VIRTUELLES DESTINEES A PORTER ASSISTANCE A DES UTILISATEURS D'APPAREILS ET DE RESEAUX DE COMMUNICATION, NOTAMMENT DANS LE CADRE DE L'ASSISTANCE LORS DE L'EMISSION DE CARTES A USAGE INDIVIDUEL

Publication

EP 1031102 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98952647 A

Priority

  • DE 19742237 A
  • DE 19744996 A
  • EP 9806107 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915997A2] The invention relates to a method and a device for creating virtual persons and for producing interaction between a virtual person and a real person, i.e. the user. The inventive virtual persons are assigned to a user H of technical devices and help the user to use said devices. They are only authenticated to act for a certain time span. As a particular example of a technical device, the invention describes a card output machine for outputting and personalising cards in which pre-existing cards are provided with data and programmes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/4446 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915997A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9915997 A2 19990401; WO 9915997 A3 19990902; DE 19744996 A1 19990610; DE 19881387 D2 20010412; EP 1031102 A2 20000830

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-13 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 20000425

2003-01-08 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-03-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: VIRTUAL PERSONS ASSISTING IN USING DEVICES AND COMMUNICATION NETWORKS, AND IN PARTICULAR IN ISSUING PERSONAL CARDS

2002-03-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: VIRTUAL PERSONS ASSISTING IN USING DEVICES AND COMMUNICATION NETWORKS, AND IN PARTICULAR IN ISSUING PERSONAL CARDS

2001-03-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: VIRTUAL PERSONS ASSISTING IN USING DEVICES AND COMMUNICATION NETWORKS, AND IN PARTICULAR IN ISSUING PERSONAL CARDS

2001-03-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: VIRTUAL PERSONS ASSISTING IN USING DEVICES UND COMMUNICATION NETWORKS, AND IN PARTICULAR IN ISSUING PERSONAL CARDS

2000-12-13 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17P

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT