Global Patent Index - EP 1031107 A1

EP 1031107 A1 2000-08-30 - METHOD FOR EVALUATING AN INPUT DATA SIGNAL AND CIRCUIT SYSTEM FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR EVALUATING AN INPUT DATA SIGNAL AND CIRCUIT SYSTEM FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM AUSWERTEN EINES EINGANGSDATENSIGNALS UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'EVALUER UN SIGNAL DE DONNEES D'ENTREE ET CIRCUIT CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1031107 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923811 A

Priority

  • DE 19827625 A
  • IB 9901128 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9967736A1] The invention relates to a method for evaluating an input data signal and to a circuit system for carrying out said method, which permit the reliable evaluation of a data signal transmitted by load modulation. The method and circuit system are characterized in that: from the input data signal a complex data signal is derived which comprises a first signal component referred to as real part and a second signal component referred to as imaginary part; an average signal of the complex data signal is formed by determining an average of the real part on the one hand and the imaginary part on the other hand; an average-free complex signal comprising an average-free real part signal and an average-free imaginary part signal is formed by determining the difference between the complex data signal and the average signal of the complex data signal; a first quadratic error signal is formed by multiplying the average-free real part signal by itself and a second quadratic error signal is formed by multiplying the average-free real part signal by the average-free imaginary part signal; a rise signal is formed by dividing the first quadratic error signal by the second quadratic error signal; a decision threshold signal is formed by multiplication of the rise signal by the average-free real part signal; and by comparing the average-free imaginary part signal with the decision threshold signal an information signal is derived which indicates whether a value of the input data signal is generated from a loaded or unloaded state during load modulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 17/00 (2006.01); G06K 7/00 (2006.01); G06K 7/10 (2006.01); H04B 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 7/0008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967736A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9967736 A1 19991229; EP 1031107 A1 20000830; JP 2002519767 A 20020702; US 6430519 B1 20020806

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB