Global patent index - EP 1031128 A1

EP 1031128 A1 2000-08-30 - ON DELAY DEVICE FOR A VISUAL DISPLAY UNIT

Title (en)

ON DELAY DEVICE FOR A VISUAL DISPLAY UNIT

Title (de)

EINSCHALTVERZÖGERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN DATENSICHTGERÄT

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TEMPORISATION DE MISE EN MARCHE POUR DISPOSITIF DE VISUALISATION

Publication

EP 1031128 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962202 A

Priority

  • DE 9803202 W
  • DE 19751577 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9927516A1] Disclosed is an ON delay device (10) for a visual display unit (14) which can be placed in an idle state by blocking at least one signal (H-SYNC IN, V-SYNC IN) controlling said visual display unit (14).The inventive ON delay device comprises inter alia one blocking device (42,44,46) which blocks said signal (H-SYNC IN, V-SYNC IN) for a predetermined delay interval. The signal is fed to the visual display unit (14) once said delay interval has elapsed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 1/16; G09G 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 1/16 (2006.01); G09G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/006 (2013.01); G09G 2330/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927516A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9927516 A1 19990603; AT 214190 T 20020315; EP 1031128 A1 20000830; EP 1031128 B1 20020306; US 6239717 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021103

2002-11-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021103

2002-10-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-06-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-06-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803302

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-11

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

2002-03-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 214190

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-02-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-05-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DELAY DEVICE FOR A VISUAL DISPLAY UNIT AND METHOD TO DEACTIVATE SUCH DISPLAY UNIT

2001-04-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DELAY DEVICE FOR A VISUAL DISPLAY UNIT AND METHOD TO DEACTIVATE SUCH DISPLAY UNIT

2001-03-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DELAY DEVICE FOR A VISUAL DSIPLAY INIT AND METHOD TO DEACTIVATE SUCH DISPLAY UNIT

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE