Global Patent Index - EP 1031162 A1

EP 1031162 A1 2000-08-30 - ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY WITH A FUSE

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY WITH A FUSE

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES RELAIS MIT SCHMELZSICHERUNG

Title (fr)

RELAIS ELECTROMAGNETIQUE A FUSIBLE

Publication

EP 1031162 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98959746 A

Priority

  • DE 9803090 W
  • DE 29720249 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2310240A1] The relay comprises a construction having coils, yokes, anchors and contacts, whereby one of the contacts is connected to a connection element (7) via the yoke (8, 9) and a plug fuse. The yoke comprises a yoke section (9) which extends laterally on the relay up to the proximity of the base side. A spring clamp (15, 16) which laterally projects outward is respectively fastened to the yoke section (9) and to the connection element (7) belonging thereto. Both spring clamps (15, 16) are laterally short-circuited on the plug fuse (12) which is mounted on the relay.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/14; H01H 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 9/10 (2006.01); H01H 50/14 (2006.01); H01H 50/26 (2006.01); H01H 50/56 (2006.01); H01H 85/00 (2006.01); H01H 85/02 (2006.01); H01H 85/147 (2006.01); H01H 85/153 (2006.01); H01H 85/22 (2006.01); H01H 89/00 (2006.01); H01H 50/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/10 (2013.01); H01H 50/02 (2013.01); H01H 50/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9926265A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29720249 U1 19980122; CA 2310240 A1 19990527; EP 1031162 A1 20000830; EP 1031162 B1 20020918; JP 2001523882 A 20011127; US 6320486 B1 20011120; WO 9926265 A1 19990527

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021031

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805640 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011203

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT