Global patent index - EP 1031238 A1

EP 1031238 A1 2000-08-30 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR COMPRESSING VIDEO INFORMATION

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR COMPRESSING VIDEO INFORMATION

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPRIMIERUNG VON VIDEODATEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR COMPRIMER DES DONNEES VIDEO

Publication

EP 1031238 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98958556 A

Priority

  • US 9824189 W
  • US 6663897 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9926418A1] A method and apparatus is disclosed for efficiently encoding data representing a video image, thereby reducing the amount of data that must be transferred to a decoder. The method includes transforming data sets utilizing a tensor product wavelet transform (32) which is capable of transmitting remainders from one subband to another. Collections of subbands, in macro-block form (36) are weighted (42), detected (46) and ranked (52) enabling prioritization of the transformed data. A motion compensation technique (56, 60) is performed on the subband data producing motion vectors (58) and prediction errors (68) which are positionally encoded into bit stream packets for transmittal to the decoder. Subband macro-blocks and subband blocks which are equal to zero are identified as such in the bit stream packets to further reduce the amount of data that must be transferred to the decoder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/30; H04N 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/30 (2006.01); G06T 9/00 (2006.01); H04N 7/26 (2006.01); H04N 7/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/90 (2014.11); H04N 19/48 (2014.11); H04N 19/51 (2013.01); H04N 19/61 (2014.11); H04N 19/619 (2014.11); H04N 19/63 (2014.11); H04N 19/645 (2014.11); H04N 19/115 (2014.11); H04N 19/146 (2014.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9926418 A1 19990527; AU 1457799 A 19990607; AU 752219 B2 20020912; CA 2310602 A1 19990527; CA 2310602 C 20090519; CN 1190084 C 20050216; CN 1281618 A 20010124; EP 1031238 A1 20000830; EP 1031238 A4 20030507; JP 2001523928 A 20011127; JP 2008289132 A 20081127; JP 4675477 B2 20110420

INPADOC legal status

2013-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20130405

2008-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080731

2003-05-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030321

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/30 A

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/32 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/26 B

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANTEON CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE