Global Patent Index - EP 1031256 A1

EP 1031256 A1 2000-08-30 - LINEAR LOUDSPEAKER

Title (en)

LINEAR LOUDSPEAKER

Title (de)

LINEARER LAUTSPRECHER

Title (fr)

HAUT-PARLEUR LINEAIRE

Publication

EP 1031256 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98940325 A

Priority

  • FR 9801636 W
  • FR 9709605 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2766650A1] The invention concerns a loudspeaker having an elongate parallelepiped hollow body (1), whereof one longitudinal surface is made up of a stretched elongate rectangular planar diaphragm (7). The diaphragm (7) is suspended by its edges (10) to the body (1) adjacent side surfaces (2), and is integral with an elongate rigid inner part (11) extending in the body (1) longitudinal direction, and bearing a mobile electromagnetic coil (13), parallel to the diaphragm. The coil (13) is arranged between two fixed magnets (5) located along the body (1) two longitudinal side surfaces (2) which form, with the base (3) of said body, polar parts. Said loudspeaker is useful as component of an active anti-noise system, associated with a double glazing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905888A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2766650 A1 19990129; AT 233981 T 20030315; AU 745676 B2 20020328; AU 8867598 A 19990216; CA 2297272 A1 19990204; CA 2297272 C 20061128; DE 69811936 D1 20030410; DE 69811936 T2 20031211; DK 1031256 T3 20030630; EP 1031256 A1 20000830; EP 1031256 B1 20030305; ES 2194343 T3 20031116; US 6285773 B1 20010904; WO 9905888 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140724

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150715

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140724

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140723

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140723

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140723

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140723

2015-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 233981 T

- Effective date: 20140723

2015-03-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-02-25 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-02-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130830

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130715

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130715

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130704

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130716

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-01-05 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-01-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2194343 T3

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-06-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69811936 P 20030410

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECHNOFIRST

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010713

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE