Global patent index - EP 1031258 A1

EP 1031258 A1 2000-08-30 - INTERFACE FOR A LAMP OPERATING DEVICE

Title (en)

INTERFACE FOR A LAMP OPERATING DEVICE

Title (de)

SCHNITTSTELLE FÜR EIN LAMPENBETRIEBSGERÄT

Title (fr)

INTERFACE POUR DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'AMPOULE

Publication

EP 1031258 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98952717 A

Priority

  • DE 19748007 A
  • EP 9806612 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19748007A1] The invention relates to an interface device (1) that receives an external control signal (a) intended for the lamp operating device and supplies relevant information (b) on lamp operation to the lamp operating device which can be connected to the interface device (1) on the output side of said control signal (a). To this end, the interface device (1) has switching means (30, 40) enabling the lamp operating device that can be connected to the interface device (1) to be turned on and/or off depending on the control signal (a) received so that the lamp operating device connected to the interface device (1) can be dimmed depending on the external control signal (a) and can be also switched by means of the interface device (1) with practically no power consumption.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/392 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2828 (2013.01); H05B 41/3921 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9923858A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19748007 A1 19990512; AT 232041 T 20030215; AU 1030699 A 19990524; EP 1031258 A1 20000830; EP 1031258 B1 20030129; WO 9923858 A1 19990514; ZA 9809827 B 19990504

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59807092

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141230

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807092

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRIDONICATCO GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010316

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI