Global Patent Index - EP 1031292 A2

EP 1031292 A2 2000-08-30 - Elastic garment with portions having differentiated radial compressions

Title (en)

Elastic garment with portions having differentiated radial compressions

Title (de)

Elastisches Unterbekleidungstück mit unterschiedlichen radialen Kompressionsteilen

Title (fr)

Sous-vêtement élastique ayant des parties dont la compression radiale est différente

Publication

EP 1031292 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830077 A

Priority

IT FI990016 U

Abstract (en)

Garment made of elastic yarn comprising at least one tubular structure (1) suited, by virtue of its elasticity, to be worn adherent to the body, in which the tubular structure (1) has at least one coaxial band (2) composed of consecutive portions (2a, 2b, 2c) having different elastic constants with respect to one another and suited to exercise a correspondingly different radial compression action (TL, TA, TP) on the body. In particular the band is the elastic band, or waistband, of the girdle of a pair of pantyhose. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41B 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41B 9/14 (2006.01); A41B 11/04 (2006.01); A41B 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41B 11/003 (2013.01); A41B 9/14 (2013.01); A41B 11/04 (2013.01); A41B 11/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031292 A2 20000830; EP 1031292 A3 20001018; IT 247823 Y1 20020910; IT FI990016 U1 20000828

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 41B 11/14 A, 7A 41B 9/14 B, 7A 41B 11/04 B

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI