Global Patent Index - EP 1031301 A1

EP 1031301 A1 2000-08-30 - Adjusting device for a seat or a lying furniture, especially for a bed

Title (en)

Adjusting device for a seat or a lying furniture, especially for a bed

Title (de)

Verstellvorrichtung für einen Sitz oder eine Liege, insbesondere für ein Bett

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage pour siège ou meuble de couchage, notamment pour lit

Publication

EP 1031301 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100768 A

Priority

DE 19908084 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19908084C1] Electric motor (10) is connected via gear mechanism (11a) to cam (12) in round disc (13) with outer teething (13a). Disc is fixed to outer frame (2). Outer teething of disc engage with inner teething of ring (14) of larger internal circumference. Bars (7) attached to ring (14) transmit displacement force to bed frame section (3,4). Motor is type used for driving motor vehicle windscreen wipers.

Abstract (de)

Eine Versteilvorrichtung für einen Sitz (1) oder eine Liege (1), insbesondere für ein Bett (1) ist mit mehreren, zumindest einem verstellbaren, untereinander mittels Gelenken (5) verbundenen Kopf- und / oder Rücken-Rostabschnitt (3), sowie ggfs. mit Bein-Rostabschnitten (4), die einen Innenrahmen (6) bilden und mittels an einzelnen Rostabschnitten angelenkten Stangen (7), die mit einem Antrieb (8), bestehend aus einem Untersetzungsgetriebe (11) und einem Elektromotor (10) antreibbar sind, ausgestattet. Um den Verstellantrieb sowohl noch kompakter als auch mit der Eigenschaft eines Einzelrost-Antriebs auszubilden, wird vorgeschlagen, daß der Elektromotor (10) über ein Getriebe (11a) an einem drehgelagerten Exzenter (12) in einer in der senkrechten Ebene befindlichen runden Scheibe (13) mit Außenverzahnung (13a) angeschlossen ist, daß die Scheibe (13) zum Außenrahmen (2) ortsfest abgestützt ist, daß die Scheibe (13) mit Außenverzahnung (13a) in einen im inneren Umfang größeren Ring (14) mit Innenverzahnung (14a) eingreift, wobei an dem Ring (14) die Stange (7) zur Übertragung der Verstellkraft auf einen Rostabschnitt (3; 4) befestigt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/08 (2006.01); A47C 1/025 (2006.01); A47C 20/04 (2006.01); H02K 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/041 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19908084 C1 20000511; CN 1264564 A 20000830; EP 1031301 A1 20000830; ID 25525 A 20001012; JP 2000245576 A 20000912; KR 20000058020 A 20000925; TW 443922 B 20010701; US 6343392 B1 20020205

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031007

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021015

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RECTICEL SCHLAFKOMFORT GMBH

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010213

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI