Global Patent Index - EP 1031305 A2

EP 1031305 A2 2000-08-30 - Display structure for piece of jewellery

Title (en)

Display structure for piece of jewellery

Title (de)

Präsentationskörper für Schmuck

Title (fr)

Elément de présentation pour article de bijouterie

Publication

EP 1031305 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103788 A

Priority

DE 19908245 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a holder (1) fixing the ring (2) or other item on the base body (3). The holder has arms (4,5) connectable at their one end to form a plug and having in one end area a first chamber for holding the ring. The holder can be clamped in the recess (15) of the base body by its plug end. The first chamber is set in that end of the holder which can be opened and can be formed by two spring tongues which are directed towards each other and form the chamber base.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Präsentationsvorrichtung für Schmuck- oder Gebrauchsgegenstände, insbesondere Ringe (2), mit einem Bodenkörper (3) und mindestens einem den Gegenstand am Bodenkörper (3) festhaltenden Haltekörper (1), wobei der Bodenkörper (13) mindestens eine Ausnehmung (15) aufweist, in die der Haltekörper (1) einsteckbar ist. Der Haltekörper (1) weist zwei Schenkel (4, 5) auf, die an ihren einen Enden gelenkig miteinander verbunden, zu einem Steckkörper, insbesondere Stöpsel, zusammenlegbar und in einem Endbereich mit einer ersten Kammer zur Halterung des Gegenstands (2) versehen sind. Der zusammengelegte Haltekörper (1) ist in der Ausnehmung (15) einklemmbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/02 (2013.01); A47F 7/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031305 A2 20000830; EP 1031305 A3 20010307; DE 19908245 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030318

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI