Global patent index - EP 1031305 A3

EP 1031305 A3 2001-03-07 - Display structure for piece of jewellery

Title (en)

Display structure for piece of jewellery

Title (de)

Präsentationskörper für Schmuck

Title (fr)

Elément de présentation pour article de bijouterie

Publication

EP 1031305 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00103788 A

Priority

DE 19908245 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1031305A2] The device has a holder (1) fixing the ring (2) or other item on the base body (3). The holder has arms (4,5) connectable at their one end to form a plug and having in one end area a first chamber for holding the ring. The holder can be clamped in the recess (15) of the base body by its plug end. The first chamber is set in that end of the holder which can be opened and can be formed by two spring tongues which are directed towards each other and form the chamber base.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/02 (2013.01); A47F 7/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031305 A2 20000830; EP 1031305 A3 20010307; DE 19908245 A1 20000831

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030318

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI