Global Patent Index - EP 1031337 A1

EP 1031337 A1 2000-08-30 - Adjustable chair

Title (en)

Adjustable chair

Title (de)

Verstellbarer Stuhl

Title (fr)

Chaise réglable

Publication

EP 1031337 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00200413 A

Priority

NL 1011365 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to an adjustable chair, which comprises: a chassis; an adjustable frame arranged on the chassis; a seat arranged on the frame such that the seat is translatable and rotatable relative to the chassis; a seat back arranged on the frame such that the seat back is translatable and rotatable relative to the seat; and blocking means for blocking the frame in a chosen and adjusted position; wherein the seat is rotatable round a first rotation zone, for instance a rotation axis, relative to the chassis and the seat back is rotatable round a second rotation zone, for instance a rotation axis, relative to the seat, this such that the rotation zones between upper body and lower body and between upper legs and lower legs of a person sitting in the chair correspond with said respective rotation zones of the chair. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/14 (2006.01); A61G 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/14 (2013.01); A61G 5/121 (2016.11); A61G 5/125 (2016.11); A61G 5/128 (2016.11)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031337 A1 20000830; NL 1011365 C2 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071228

2007-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070612

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001124;LT PAYMENT 20001124;LV PAYMENT 20001124;MK PAYMENT 20001124;RO PAYMENT 20001124;SI PAYMENT 20001124

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI