Global Patent Index - EP 1031339 A2

EP 1031339 A2 2000-08-30 - Lifting slings

Title (en)

Lifting slings

Title (de)

Gurthebeeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Harnais ou sangle pour élévateurs pour invalides

Publication

EP 1031339 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301246 A

Priority

  • GB 9904298 A
  • GB 9923608 A

Abstract (en)

A lifting sling (10) can be used with either an invalid hoist (11) which includes lifting studs or a hoist (12) having a coat-hanger type support (13). The sling (10) includes a main body portion which is shaped to support the back and thighs of a patient and is provided with four-point suspension means (15), two at the sides of the sling (10) in the shoulder region and two at the bottom end of the main body portion of the sling (10). The material forming each suspension means (15) has one or more elongated slots (20A, 20B, 20C and 20D) for engagement with either the lifting studs or the coat-hanger type support (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/1051 (2013.01); A61G 7/10 (2013.01); A61G 7/1061 (2013.01); A61G 7/1076 (2013.01); A61G 7/1078 (2013.01); A61G 2200/32 (2013.01); A61G 2200/34 (2013.01); A61G 2205/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2195978 A 19880420 - JAMES IND LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031339 A2 20000830; EP 1031339 A3 20010411; GB 2347135 A 20000830; GB 2347135 B 20010124; GB 9923608 D0 19991208

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011012

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI