Global Patent Index - EP 1031380 A3

EP 1031380 A3 2001-01-17 - Blood collection assembly and method for its manufacture

Title (en)

Blood collection assembly and method for its manufacture

Title (de)

Blutsammelanordnung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de collection de sang et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 1031380 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00101819 A

Priority

US 25617099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6077235A] An assembly for collection of a blood sample includes a hydrophobic plastic tube and a non-exudable block or graft copolymer having a hydrophobic domain compatible with and interpenetrated in the matrix of the tube plastic and a hydrophilic domain which provides a hydrophilic interior wall surface to the container. The invention includes a method to make the container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 1/00 (2006.01); A61B 5/15 (2006.01); A61B 5/154 (2006.01); B01L 3/14 (2006.01); G01N 1/10 (2006.01); G01N 33/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/50825 (2013.01); A61B 5/15003 (2013.01); A61B 5/150274 (2013.01); A61B 5/150351 (2013.01); A61B 5/150396 (2013.01); A61B 5/150519 (2013.01); A61B 5/150732 (2013.01); A61B 5/154 (2013.01); Y10T 436/108331 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6077235 A 20000620; DE 60012599 D1 20040909; DE 60012599 T2 20050804; EP 1031380 A2 20000830; EP 1031380 A3 20010117; EP 1031380 B1 20040804; JP 2000271106 A 20001003; JP 3364609 B2 20030108; US 6290655 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160111

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-01-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050117

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60012599

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI