Global Patent Index - EP 1031383 A2

EP 1031383 A2 2000-08-30 - Roll coating applicator

Title (en)

Roll coating applicator

Title (de)

Rad-Auftragsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'application à rouleau

Publication

EP 1031383 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102528 A

Priority

DE 29903308 U

Abstract (en)

The fluid applicator roll has an elastically deformable sealing element between the pressure piece and contact element components of a roll end seal. The fluid applicator (2) comprises an applicator roll, a scraper with a blade for stripping excess fluid from the rotating roll, and a roll end seal for sealing between the housing (4) and the blade and/or the roll, the seal having a contact element which is in contact with the roll and/or the blade and which can be clamped by a pressure piece. An elastically deformable sealing element is located between the pressure piece and the contact element.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Rad-Auftragsvorrichtung zum Auftragen eines Fluids auf ein Substrat, mit einer an einem Gehäuse (4) rotierbar gelagerten Auftragswalze (20), deren Umfangsfläche mit einem Fluid beaufschlagbar ist und an der das Substrat so vorbeibewegt werden kann, daß Fluid von der Oberfläche der Auftragswalze (20) auf das Substrat übertragen wird, mit einer mit der Auftragswalze (20) zusammenwirkenden Rakeleinrichtung (24) mit einem Rakelelement (30), das so relativ zu der Oberfläche der Auftragswalze (20) angeordnet ist, daß auf der rotierenden Auftragswalze (20) befindliches Fluid teilweise abgestreift wird, und mit mindestens einer im seitlichen Endbereich der Auftragswalze (20) angeordneten Dichtungseinrichtung (42) zum seitlichen Abdichten zwischen dem Rakelelement (30) und/oder der Auftragswalze (20) und dem Gehäuse (4) der Auftragsvorrichtung (2), wobei die Dichtungseinrichtung (42) ein mit der Auftragswalze (20) und/oder dem Rakelelement (30) in Kontakt stehendes, mittels eines Druckstücks (46) verspannbares Kontaktelement (50) aufweist. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß ein elastisch verformbares Dichtungselement (48) zwischen dem Druckstück (46) und dem Kontaktelement (50) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 1/08; B05C 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/08 (2006.01); B05C 11/04 (2006.01); B42C 9/00 (2006.01); B42C 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42C 11/04 (2013.01); B42C 9/0006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903308 U1 19990930; EP 1031383 A2 20000830; EP 1031383 A3 20060405

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-06-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061006

2006-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2006-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI