Global patent index - EP 1031387 A1

EP 1031387 A1 2000-08-30 - Device to reveal metal fragments in a material flow being driven through a duct pipe

Title (en)

Device to reveal metal fragments in a material flow being driven through a duct pipe

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Ermitteln von Metallteilen in einem durch eine Rohrleitung geführten Materialstrom

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour dépister des fragments de métal dans un flux de matériau passant dans une conduite

Publication

EP 1031387 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99103827 A

Priority

EP 99103827 A

Abstract (en)

The assembly (3) to detect metal particles in a material flow through a pipe (2) has a coil structure (17,18,18') round the pipe (2), for a signal to be generated if a metal particle moves past. The coil structure is firmly bonded with the outer side of a tube section (6) integrated into the pipe (2). The coil windings (17,18,18') can be at a gap from the outer side of the tube section (6), or at the outer side of a coil body (19) bonded to the tube section (6). The windings (17,18,18') are adhesive bonded to the coil body (19). The coil body (19) is of a porous and absorbent material, and it is impregnated with an adhesive and/or a resin at least at the outer side. The coil structure is contained within a shrouding housing (20), of an electrically conductive material, which extends over the ends of the coil structure along the longitudinal line of the pipe by at least the dimensions of the tube section (6) diameter. Both ends of the housing (20) lie on the tube section (6). A stiffening filling material (21) is in the intermediate zone between the tube section or the coil structure and the shrouding housing, especially of a plastics foam. The tube section (6) is of a non-metal and preferably antistatic material, such as a paper or cardboard tube impregnated with a resin.

Abstract (de)

Ein Detektor (3) besteht aus einer Spulenanordnung (17, 18, 18'), welche einen Rohrabschnitt (6) umgibt. Die Wicklungen dieser Spulenanordnung sind fest mit der Aussenseite des Rohrabschnitts verbunden, wobei dazwischen noch ein Wickelkörper (19) angeordnet sein kann. Die Spulenanordnung ist von einem Abschirmgehäuse (21) umgeben und der Zwischenraum zwischen Rohrabschnitt bzw. Spulenanordnung und Abschirmgehäuse kann mit einem versteifenden Kunststoffschaum (21) gefüllt sein. Mit dieser Anordnung ergibt sich ein kompakter Detektor, der unmittelbar in eine Rohrleitung (2) integriert werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 5/344; D01B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/344 (2006.01); D01B 3/02 (2006.01); D01G 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/344 (2013.01); D01B 3/025 (2013.01); D01G 31/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031387 A1 20000830

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020118

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE GB IT LI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI