Global patent index - EP 1031399 A1

EP 1031399 A1 2000-08-30 - Device for subdividing workpieces

Title (en)

Device for subdividing workpieces

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zerteilen von Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour découper des pièces

Publication

EP 1031399 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103292 A

Priority

DE 19908153 A

Abstract (en)

The pliers have two arms (1,2), one with a replaceable cutter blade (3), the other with an anvil (5). One of the grip parts (9) of the arms has an integral openable chamber (11) for reserve blades. The chamber is located in a core part (14) of the arm, and is kept closed by a grip shell (16) of that arm. The grip shaell is U-shaped and pivoted. The chamber has an offset screwdriver located in front of the blades to stop them from falling out.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Zerteilen von Werkstücken in Form einer Zange, wobei der eine Zangenarm (2) am arbeitsendseitigen Abschnitt eine wechselbare Klinge (3) trägt, die durch Aufeinanderzubewegen der beiden Griffabschnitte (9,10) der Zangenarme (1,2) gegen einen Amboß (5) des beidendseitigen Abschnitts des anderen Zangenarmes (1) tritt. Um eine solche Schere handhabungstechnisch in herstellungstechnisch einfacher Weise zu verbessern ist vorgesehen, daß einer der beiden Griffabschnitte (10) eine verschlossene, aber öffenbare Kammer (11) ausbildet zur Aufnahme von Reserveklingen, wobei die Kammer (11) in einem Kernteil (14) des Zangenarmes (2) sitzt und von einer Griffschale (16) geschlossen gehalten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 17/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5673487 A 19971007 - MALAGNOUX ROGER [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031399 A1 20000830; DE 19908153 A1 20000831; US 6260279 B1 20010717

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030304

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI