Global patent index - EP 1031413 A2

EP 1031413 A2 2000-08-30 - Radiation-sensitive recording material for the production of waterless offset printing plates

Title (en)

Radiation-sensitive recording material for the production of waterless offset printing plates

Title (de)

Strahlungsempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial zur Herstellung von Wasserlos-Offsetdruckplatten

Title (fr)

Matériau d'enregistrement sensible aux radiations pour la fabrication de plaques d'impression offset sans eau

Publication

EP 1031413 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103354 A

Priority

DE 19908528 A

Abstract (en)

An infrared-sensitive recording medium comprises in sequence: (a) a support; (b) a primer layer comprising a mixture of an unmodified epoxy resin (I), a functionalized polymer (II) and a crosslinking agent that reacts with (I) and (II); (c) an infrared-sensitive layer; and (d) a silicone layer. An Independent claim is also included for a process for producing a plate for waterless offset printing, comprising irradiating the recording medium imagewise with infrared radiation (preferably laser radiation) and removing ablated material with water or an aqueous solution.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein IR-strahlungsempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial mit einem Träger, einer Grundierschicht, einer IR-absorbierenden Schicht und einer Silikonschicht. Die Grundierschicht enthält eine Mischung aus einem nichtmodifizierten Epoxidharz, einem weiteren organischen Polymer, das funktionelle Gruppen aufweist und einem Vernetzer, der mit dem Epoxidharz und den funktionellen Gruppen des organischen Polymers reagiert. Bevorzugt enthält sie auch noch Pigmente, insbesondere anorganische Pigmente. Zur Herstellung einer Druckform für den wasserlosen Offsetdruck wird das Aufzeichnungsmaterial mit IR-Strahlung, insbesondere mit IR-Laserstrahlung, bildmäßig belichtet und anschließend mit Wasser oder einer wäßrigen Lösung von den ablatierten Schichtbestandteilen befreit. Die Grundierschicht bewirkt eine besonders gute Haftung der IR-absorbierenden Schicht auf dem Träger, ohne dabei die Entfernung der bestrahlten Bereiche der IR-absorbierenden Schicht beim Entwickeln zu behindern.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/004 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41N 1/14 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/075 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1016 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/14 (2013.01); B41C 2210/16 (2016.11); B41C 2210/22 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01); B41C 2210/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031413 A2 20000830; EP 1031413 A3 20010221; EP 1031413 B1 20040428; DE 19908528 A1 20000831; JP 2000250202 A 20000914; US 6576399 B1 20030610

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070222

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070222

2006-01-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-04-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-01-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050124

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-13 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006200

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI