Global Patent Index - EP 1031420 A1

EP 1031420 A1 2000-08-30 - Device for the monitoring of safety-relevant processes in machines

Title (en)

Device for the monitoring of safety-relevant processes in machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Überwachung von sicherheitsrelevanten Vorgängen an Maschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la surveillance des processus sûreté-appropriés aux machines

Publication

EP 1031420 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99103804 A

Priority

DE 19908230 A

Abstract (en)

The device has at least one field bus system (2) that connects an operating controller (1), a safety-relevant input/output device (4) and at least one safety monitoring controller (6). The safety input/output device and/or safety monitoring controller is/are mounted on the control/drive elements (9,10) performing the safety-relevant functions in a distributed manner. Independent claim is also included for a method of monitoring safety-relevant processes in drive/control arrangement in machines.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung und ein Verfahren zur Überwachung sicherheitsrelevanter Vorgänge an Stell-/Antriebselementen von Maschinen. Der sicherheitsrelevante Vorgang wird durch mindestens eine Sicherheits Ein-/Ausgabeeinrichtung (4) und eine zentrale Sicherheitsüberwachungssteuerung (6) überwacht. Die Sicherheits Ein-/Ausgabeeinrichtung (4), die Sicherheitsüberwachungssteuerung (6) und die Betriebssteuerung (1) der Maschine sind mittels Feldbussystem (2) miteinander verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B42D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0009 (2013.01); B41F 33/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031420 A1 20000830; EP 1031420 B1 20040811; DE 19908230 A1 20000831; EP 1454747 A2 20040908; EP 1454747 A3 20071010; EP 1454747 B1 20140402; JP 2000246878 A 20000912; JP 5052710 B2 20121017; US 6832121 B1 20041214

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160226

2016-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59910196

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-10-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910196

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000715

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI