Global patent index - EP 1031422 A2

EP 1031422 A2 2000-08-30 - Ink jet head

Title (en)

Ink jet head

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlkopf

Title (fr)

Tête à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1031422 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00107972 A

Priority

  • EP 95301259 A
  • JP 5987294 A
  • JP 684595 A

Abstract (en)

A multi-nozzle ink jet head comprising a plurality of pressure chambers adapted for accommodating ink; a plate or plates including a plurality of nozzles for jetting ink particles out of the pressure chambers when pressure is applied to the pressure chambers; a pressurizing member (43) including a plurality of pressurizing plates (22) separated from one another and provided for respective ones of the pressure chambers; and actuating means for driving each pressurizing plate (22) independently in order to apply pressure to said pressure chambers; wherein said pressurizing member (43) comprises a common holding member (430), said plurality of pressurizing plates (22), and a plurality of ribs connecting said plurality of pressurizing plates (22) to said common holding member (430). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/045; B41J 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14274 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14387 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14491 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0670218 A2 19950906; EP 0670218 A3 19970108; EP 0670218 B1 20021211; DE 69529112 D1 20030123; DE 69529112 T2 20030417; DE 69529354 D1 20030213; DE 69529354 T2 20040401; EP 1031422 A2 20000830; EP 1031422 A3 20010110; EP 1031422 B1 20030108; JP 2721127 B2 19980304; JP H07290705 A 19951107

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110227

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69529354

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110227

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100205

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100224

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-06-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69529354

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 670218

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010308

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-08-30 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 670218

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB