Global Patent Index - EP 1031430 A1

EP 1031430 A1 2000-08-30 - Ink transfer ribbon with markings

Title (en)

Ink transfer ribbon with markings

Title (de)

Farbtransferband mit Markierungen

Title (fr)

Ruban d'impression par transfert d'encre avec marquages

Publication

EP 1031430 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400487 A

Priority

FR 9902283 A

Abstract (en)

The use of indexing marks alongside the colored ink regions enables determination of the current position of the printing ribbon. The printing ribbon which operates by transfer of ink in a printer supports a series of sequences (7,8) of printing ink regions (1-6). The ink regions are of different colors (1,4; 2,5;3,6) and have different markings (11-16) printed alongside the ink regions. The marking zones (18-21) are situated along one edge of the ribbon to enable identification of the position of the successive colored printing ink regions. A reading and detection system is provided to locate the colored printing ink regions by use of the edge marking zone.

Abstract (fr)

Ruban d'impression par transfert d'encre pour dispositif d'impression, supportant une série de séquences (7, 8) de plages successives (1-6) d'encre d'impression, de différentes couleurs, et différents marquages (11-16) associés aux différentes plages (1-6) de différentes couleurs, respectivement, l'un au moins des marquages étant constitué par l'un des bords (13, 14) d'une zone de marquage (19) s'étendant le long de deux plages successives (2, 3), le bord avant (13) de ladite zone (19) constituant le marquage associé à la deuxième des deux plages successives (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 31/00; B41J 35/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 17/36 (2006.01); B41J 31/00 (2006.01); B41J 35/18 (2006.01); B41J 35/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 17/36 (2013.01); B41J 31/00 (2013.01); B41J 35/18 (2013.01); B41J 35/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031430 A1 20000830; EP 1031430 B1 20060614; DE 60028628 D1 20060727; DE 60028628 T2 20070524; FR 2789934 A1 20000825; FR 2789934 B1 20010420

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160223

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160223

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160223

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60028628

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM TELECOMMUNICATIONS S. A., PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60028628

- Effective date: 20130129

2013-03-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60028628

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

- Effective date: 20130129

2013-03-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60028628

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

- Effective date: 20130129

2013-01-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60028628

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM COMMUNICATION, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60028628

- Effective date: 20120507

2012-06-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60028628

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

- Effective date: 20120507

2012-06-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60028628

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

- Effective date: 20120507

2012-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60028628

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2009-04-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090326 AND 20090401

2007-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070315

2006-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060913

2006-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060925

2006-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60028628 P 20060727

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2006-06-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEM COMMUNICATION

2005-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050117

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CAVARERO, ERIC

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BROT, MICHEL

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI