Global Patent Index - EP 1031435 A1

EP 1031435 A1 2000-08-30 - Device for binding a stack of documents

Title (en)

Device for binding a stack of documents

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Binden eines Dokumentenstapels

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour relier une pile de documents

Publication

EP 1031435 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99103482 A

Priority

EP 99103482 A

Abstract (en)

A document stack (2) is bound by the device comprising at least one holding component (3) consisting of upper and lower clamp parts (5,6), a back part (7,8) and two side parts (10) vertical to the back part. The upper clamp part can be inserted in the lower clamp part. The side parts of the upper clamp part are flexible, being pressed together when the upper clamp part is inserted in the lower clamp part. The side parts of the upper clamp part spring back to their original position when the upper clamp part is withdrawn from the lower clamp part. A binding back (14) with U-shaped cross-section is provided, and preferably has at least the same length as the edge of the document stack to be bound.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Binden eines Dokumentenstapels (2) mit zumindest einem Halteelement (3), wobei das Halteelement (3) aus einem oberen Klemmteil (5) und einem unteren Klemmteil (6) mit jeweils einem Rückenteil (7, 8) und zwei im wesentlichen senkrecht zum jeweiligen Rückenteil (7, 8) angeordneten Seitenteilen (9, 10) besteht, wobei das obere Klemmteil (5) in das untere Klemmteil (6) hineinschiebbar bzw. aus dem unteren Klemmteil (6) herausbewegbar ist und wobei die Seitenteile (9) des oberen Klemmteils (5) flexibel ausgestaltet sind und zusammengedrückt werden, wenn das obere Klemmteil (5) in das untere Klemmteil (6) hineingeschoben wird bzw. wobei die Seitenteile (9) des oberen Klemmteils (5) in ihre ursprüngliche Lage zurückfedern, wenn das obere Klemmteil (5) aus dem unteren Klemmteil (6) herausbewegt wird. Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, eine einfach zu handhabende und kostengünstige Vorrichtung zum Binden eines Dokumentenstapels vorzuschlagen. Die Aufgabe wird dadurch gelöst, daß ein Binderücken (14) mit u-förmigem Querschnitt vorgesehen ist, der vorzugsweise zumindest dieselbe Länge aufweist wie die jeweils zu bindende Kante des Dokumentenstapels (2), und daß Halteelement (3) und Binderücken (14) miteinander verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 1/00 (2006.01); B42F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42B 5/06 (2013.01); B42F 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031435 A1 20000830; EP 1031435 B1 20030709; DE 59906257 D1 20030814

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-12-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906257

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100224

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110419

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100223

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100223

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-09-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ESSELTE N.V.

- Effective date: 20100228

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090205

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090204

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090204

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-28 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032936

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906257 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR NL SE

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB GR NL SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR NL SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI