Global Patent Index - EP 1031524 A2

EP 1031524 A2 2000-08-30 - Yarn winding apparatus

Title (en)

Yarn winding apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufwickeln eines Fadens

Title (fr)

Dispositif de bobinage de fil

Publication

EP 1031524 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00103006 A

Priority

  • JP 5095499 A
  • JP 5095599 A

Abstract (en)

The shock imparted by the contact roller against the package when a yarn winding apparatus switches from gap winding to normal winding is lessened. An elastic holding means 21, such as a plate spring or the like, is positioned between frame 6 and slide box 7. The slide box 7 can be raised and lowered relative to the frame 6, and holds a contact roller 5. The elastic holding means 21 exerts elastic counter-force in the opposite direction to that in which the contact roller 5 is drawn to the package 3. This softens the sudden spike in contact pressure normally seen when the contact roller 5 makes contact with the package 3. Additionally, the distance of separation between the contact roller 5 and the bobbin 2 can be reliably maintained at the pre-set level during gap winding. This makes it easier to estimate the exact contact time at which the contact roller 5 will meet the package 3, thereby enabling the switch from programmed control of the bobbin rotation speed to feedback control of the bobbin rotation speed to be timed precisely to the moment of contact between the contact roller 5 and the bobbin 2. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/40; B65H 54/42; B65H 54/44; B65H 54/52; B65H 59/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/40 (2006.01); B65H 54/42 (2006.01); B65H 54/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/40 (2013.01); B65H 54/42 (2013.01); B65H 54/52 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031524 A2 20000830; EP 1031524 A3 20020703

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI