Global Patent Index - EP 1031533 A1

EP 1031533 A1 2000-08-30 - Liquid dispensing device and use for dispensing high purity liquid

Title (en)

Liquid dispensing device and use for dispensing high purity liquid

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsabgabevorrichtung und Verwendung zum Abgeben einer hochreinen Flüssigkeit

Title (fr)

Système de distribution de liquide et son utilisation pour la distribution d'un liquide ultra-pur

Publication

EP 1031533 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403239 A

Priority

FR 9902467 A

Abstract (en)

The liquid distribution system has a supply tank holding liquid with a head space under a preset pressure connected to an intermediate storage tank with a headspace at a higher pressure and receiving tanks arranged in parallel and supplying a user network. The volume of the receiving tanks is much smaller than that of the intermediate tank. The receiving tanks are filled and emptied by applying respectively a lower and higher pressure relative to the pressure in the intermediate tank. All the tanks may be pressurized using nitrogen. The intermediate tank volume is 220 l - 5 m<3>. Each receiving tank is a tube of 1-50 l. The supply tanks are at 100 mbar, the intermediate tank at 100-500 mbar and the emptying pressure applied to the receiving tanks is 0.5-6 bar. Liquid is recycled back from the user network to the intermediate tank. The connection between the supply and intermediate tanks includes filters.

Abstract (fr)

Le liquide à distribuer part d'un réservoir (3A, 3B) maintenu sous une première surpression P1, d'où il est transféré à une cuve intermédiaire de stockage (11) maintenue sous une pression intermédiaire prédéterminée P2 > P1. En aval de cette cuve sont montés en parallèle plusieurs récipients de distribution de faible volume (12A, 12B), dont chacun peut être mis soit à une pression de distribution P3 > P2, soit à une pression de remplissage P4 < P2. Application à la distribution de produits chimiques ultra-purs destinés à l'industrie micro-électronique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/02; B67D 5/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17D 1/08 (2006.01); B67D 7/02 (2010.01); B67D 7/78 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/02 (2013.01); B67D 7/0272 (2013.01); B67D 7/0283 (2013.01); B67D 7/78 (2013.01); Y10T 137/0396 (2015.04); Y10T 137/3124 (2015.04); Y10T 137/3127 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031533 A1 20000830; EP 1031533 B1 20031015; DE 69912089 D1 20031120; DE 69912089 T2 20040722; FR 2790253 A1 20000901; FR 2790253 B1 20010420; JP 2000249299 A 20000912; SG 76001 A1 20001024; TW 418299 B 20010111; US 6267132 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091221

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091221

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091221

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040117

2003-11-20 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69912089 P 20031120

2003-11-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IE IT

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IE IT

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IE IT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI