Global Patent Index - EP 1031589 A1

EP 1031589 A1 2000-08-30 - Supramolecular compound

Title (en)

Supramolecular compound

Title (de)

Supramolekulare Verbindung

Title (fr)

Composé supramoléculaire

Publication

EP 1031589 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00200583 A

Priority

NL 1011386 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a compound comprising a reaction product of (A) an isocyanate functional compound of which at least 40 wt.%, relative to the total amount of (A), has a molecular weight of at least about 500, and (B) a nitrogen-containing compound capable of reacting with said isocyanate functional compound (A). The reaction product has a molecular weight of less than about 20,000 and comprises an effective amount of groups that are able to form reversible intermolecular physical interactions such that a resulting compound shows polymeric mechanical properties at a temperature below a transition temperature. The nitrogen-containing compound is, for instance, melamine, urea, acetoguanamine, benzoguanamine, cyanamide, dicyanamide, thiourea, isocytosine, pyrimidone or aminopyridine. The supramolecular compound comprising a suitable amount of the reaction products exhibits a relatively high elongation at break.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 18/10; C08G 18/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/10 (2006.01); C08G 18/32 (2006.01); C08G 18/38 (2006.01); C08G 18/48 (2006.01); C08G 18/66 (2006.01); C09D 11/00 (2006.01); C09D 175/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/6674 (2013.01); C08G 18/3851 (2013.01); C08G 18/4854 (2013.01); C08G 83/008 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2929 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2933 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2938 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2964 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0025992 A2 19810401 - HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]
  • [X] DE 2364157 A1 19740704 - TOYO INK MFG CO
  • [X] DE 2625399 A1 19761230 - THIOKOL CORP
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 80, no. 20, 20 May 1974, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 109584w, SHIGERU ET AL: "Linear polyurethane elastomer" page 53; column 2; XP002119697 & JP H04829398 A
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 97, no. 10, September 1982, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 73427g, VESELOVSKII ET AL: "Adhesive Composition" page 50; column 1; XP002119698 & SU 910718 A1 19820307 - INST CHIMII VYSOKOMOLEKULYARNY [SU], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031589 A1 20000830; EP 1031589 B1 20050824; AT 302803 T 20050915; DE 60022107 D1 20050929; DE 60022107 T2 20060622; JP 2000351824 A 20001219; JP 5000797 B2 20120815; NL 1011386 C2 20000828; US 6683151 B1 20040127

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160502

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *SUPRAPOLIX B.V.HORSTEN 1, NL-5612 EINDHOVEN

- Effective date: 20050824

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *SUPRAPOLIX B.V.

- Effective date: 20050824

2007-09-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2007-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SUPRAPOLIX B.V.

- Free text: DSM IP ASSETS B.V.#HET OVERLOON 1#6411 TE HEERLEN (NL) -TRANSFER TO- SUPRAPOLIX B.V.#HORSTEN 1#5612 AX EINDHOFEN (NL)

2007-08-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SUPRAPOLIX B.V.

- Effective date: 20070507

2007-06-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-11-15 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-08-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060526

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-01-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060124

2005-11-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-11-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-11-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-09-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60022107 P 20050929

2005-09-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-08-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-08-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-08-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-08-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050824

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040422

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DSM IP ASSETS B.V.

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI