Global Patent Index - EP 1031623 A2

EP 1031623 A2 2000-08-30 - Process for calaytic cracking of heavy volatile hydrocarbons

Title (en)

Process for calaytic cracking of heavy volatile hydrocarbons

Title (de)

Verfahren zur katalytischen Spaltung von flüchtigen höheren Kohlenwasserstoffen

Title (fr)

Procédé de craquage catalytique d'hydrocarbures volatils lourds

Publication

EP 1031623 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101992 A

Priority

DE 19907901 A

Abstract (en)

Process for catalytically splitting carbonaceous material during gasification at 700-1200 (preferably 850-950) degrees C comprises using a fluidized bed made up of particles selected from oxides, hydroxides and carbonates of calcium, aluminum, silicon, nickel, titanium, iron, cobalt, and molybdenum in a stoichiometric excess.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Vergasung von kohlenstoffhaltigen Massen in einer Wirbelschicht fällt ein Rohgas mit einem Gehalt an flüchtigen, höheren Kohlenwasserstoffen der C6- bis C22-Bindungssysteme an. Zur Entfernung dieser Kohlenwasserstoffe wird ein Wirbelbett verwendet, dessen katalytisch wirkende Partikel aus wenigstens einem der Stoffe, ausgewählt aus Oxiden, Hydroxiden und Carbonaten des Calciums, Aluminiums, Siliciums, Nickels, Magnesiums, Titans, Eisens, Cobalts und Molybdäns bestehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10J 3/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 11/18 (2006.01); C10J 3/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 11/18 (2013.01); C10J 3/482 (2013.01); C10J 3/54 (2013.01); C10K 1/024 (2013.01); C10K 1/026 (2013.01); C10K 3/023 (2013.01); C10J 2300/092 (2013.01); C10J 2300/0996 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1807 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1884 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031623 A2 20000830; EP 1031623 A3 20021218; EP 1031623 B1 20070613; AT 364672 T 20070715; DE 19907901 A1 20000907; DE 19907901 C2 20011129; DE 50014394 D1 20070726

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 364672

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-02 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50014394

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140403

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140212

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-05-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080314

2007-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50014394

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-07-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-07-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070613

2007-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2007-06-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENVIROTHERM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040915

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030618

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 10J 3/54 A, 7C 10G 11/18 B

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI