Global patent index - EP 1031631 A2

EP 1031631 A2 2000-08-30 - A method of spheroidizing annealing of hypo-eutectoid low alloy steel

Title (en)

A method of spheroidizing annealing of hypo-eutectoid low alloy steel

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Glühen auf kugeligem Carbide von untereutektoidischen niedriglegierten Stählen

Title (fr)

Procédé de recuit de sphéroidisation d'acier hypoeutectoidique faiblement allié

Publication

EP 1031631 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00850027 A

Priority

SE 9900598 A

Abstract (en)

Method of spheroidizing annealing of hypo-eutectoid low alloy steel, wherein a hot rolled steel typical comprising ferrite and a high carbon phase such as pearlite or martensitic/bainitic microstructural constituents a) is heated to a temperature between A1 and A3 until austenitic domains with higher carbon content than the base composition has been created, b) the temperature is lowered and held under A1 to enable the austenite to transform into ferrite and carbides, c) the temperature is held under A1 until a desired degree of spheroidizing of the carbide is obtained. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 1/32; C21D 1/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 6/00 (2006.01); C21D 1/26 (2006.01); C21D 1/32 (2006.01); C21D 1/78 (2006.01); C21D 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/32 (2013.01); C21D 1/785 (2013.01); C21D 1/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031631 A2 20000830; EP 1031631 A3 20031008; CN 1265427 A 20000906; JP 2000239737 A 20000905; SE 521770 C2 20031202; SE 9900598 D0 19990222; SE 9900598 L 20000823

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041026

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040408

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI