Global Patent Index - EP 1031638 A1

EP 1031638 A1 2000-08-30 - High purity aluminium foil for electrolytic capacitors

Title (en)

High purity aluminium foil for electrolytic capacitors

Title (de)

Aluminiumfolie mit hoher Reinheit für elektrolytische Kondensatoren

Title (fr)

Feuille en aluminium raffiné pour condensateurs électrolytiques

Publication

EP 1031638 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420034 A

Priority

FR 9902386 A

Abstract (en)

A high purity aluminum foil, has a uniform surface distribution of lead, boron and/or indium. More than 99.9% purity aluminum foil contains 0.1-10 ppm total of lead (Pb), boron (B) and/or indium (In) with a distribution, in a 0.1 mu m deep surface zone, such that their ion analysis signal intensity has a dispersion ratio, (Imax - Imin)/Imean, of less than 5, preferably 2. An Independent claim is also included for manufacture of the above thin foil.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet une feuille mince en aluminium raffiné de pureté supérieure à 99,9% d'aluminium, destinée à la fabrication d'anodes de condensateurs électrolytiques, ayant une teneur pondérale moyenne pour la somme des éléments Pb + B + In comprise entre 0,1 et 10 ppm (de préférence entre 0,5 et 5 ppm), pour laquelle la répartition de ces 3 éléments dans la zone superficielle de profondeur 0,1 µm est telle que leur intensité de signal obtenue par analyse ionique présente un rapport de dispersion : Rd = (Imax - Imin)/Imoyen inférieur à 5, et de préférence à 2. Elle conduit à une meilleure aptitude à la piqûration de la feuille, entraînant une capacité supérieure pour le condensateur réalisé à partir de cette feuille. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/00; C22F 1/04; H01G 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01G 9/055 (2006.01); C22C 21/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/04 (2006.01); H01G 9/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/00 (2013.01); C22F 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] EP 0490574 A1 19920617 - SHOWA ALUMINIUM CO LTD [JP]
  • [A] US 3498765 A 19700303 - HUNTER MATTHEW SCOTT
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 05 31 May 1996 (1996-05-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 09 31 October 1995 (1995-10-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 02 31 March 1995 (1995-03-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 10 31 August 1998 (1998-08-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 267 (E - 1217) 16 June 1992 (1992-06-16)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 082 (C - 1164) 10 February 1994 (1994-02-10)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031638 A1 20000830; EP 1031638 B1 20040407; CN 1201350 C 20050511; CN 1264906 A 20000830; DE 60009591 D1 20040513; DE 60009591 T2 20050421; FR 2790008 A1 20000825; FR 2790008 B1 20010413; HK 1028924 A1 20041209; JP 2000252170 A 20000914; KR 100696971 B1 20070321; KR 20000058136 A 20000925; RU 2231847 C2 20040627; TW I233452 B 20050601; US 6471793 B1 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100217

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-09-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090224

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-02-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050217

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60009591 P 20040513

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT NL

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT NL

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI