Global Patent Index - EP 1031652 A3

EP 1031652 A3 2000-09-06 - Warp tension device with a gradual-action suspension for weaving looms

Title (en)

Warp tension device with a gradual-action suspension for weaving looms

Title (de)

Spannvorrichtung mit progressiver Federung für die Webkette in Webmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de tension de la foule avec suspension progressive pour métiers à tisser

Publication

EP 1031652 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99125153 A

Priority

IT MI982709 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1031652A2] A warp tension device is disclosed, of the type comprising a compensating cylinder (1) supported on at least two stations arranged along the width of the loom and on at least two support elements (2,3) for each station, movable by the action of a force expressed by the tension of the warp yarns passing over it and an opposing action of a resilient element (7), wherein the displacements of the two support elements (2,3) of each station are in a respective relationship established by a predefined kinematic mechanism, said resilient element (7) reacting to the displacement of at least one of said support elements (2,3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 49/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031652 A2 20000830; EP 1031652 A3 20000906; IT 1304112 B1 20010307; IT MI982709 A1 20000619

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20060525

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROMATECH S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI