Global Patent Index - EP 1031654 A1

EP 1031654 A1 2000-08-30 - Joint for a laundry rack

Title (en)

Joint for a laundry rack

Title (de)

Gelenk für einen Wäschetrockner

Title (fr)

Articulation d'une séchoir à linge

Publication

EP 1031654 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122242 A

Priority

DE 19906534 A

Abstract (en)

In the joint for a laundry drying stand each outer joint part (20) is equipped with a mounting tube (20). The mounting tube (21) runs tangentially or radially in relation to the outer part (20). A rod (25) of a dryer frame section can be inserted in the tube (21).

Abstract (de)

Gelenk für einen Wäschetrockner umfassend wenigstens zwei in ihrem Winkel gegeneinander um eine gemeinsame Gelenkachse verstellbare Gelenkteile, wobei jedes Gelenkteil jeweils mit einem Rahmenteil des Wäschetrockners verbindbar ist. Die Gelenkteile umfassen wenigstens zwei jeweils etwa ringförmige Gelenkaußenteile (20) und jedes Gelenkaußenteil (20) ist jeweils mit einer radial oder etwa tangential abgehenden Aufnahmehülse (21) versehen, in die eine Strebe (25) eines Rahmenteils (2, 3, 4, 5) des Wäschetrockners einsteckbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 57/08; F16C 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 57/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 57/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031654 A1 20000830; DE 19906534 A1 20000831; DE 19906534 B4 20071115

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020906

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI