Global Patent Index - EP 1031655 A1

EP 1031655 A1 2000-08-30 - Ironing shoe and electrical steam iron

Title (en)

Ironing shoe and electrical steam iron

Title (de)

Bügeleisenschuh und elektrisches Dampfbügeleisen

Title (fr)

Semelle amovible pour fer à repasser et fer à repasser électrique à vapeur

Publication

EP 1031655 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99103365 A

Priority

EP 99103365 A

Abstract (en)

The insert (13) has a capillary layer (14,15) on the side facing the top side (12) of the sole basic body (9). The capillary layer (14,15) is made of moisture absorbing material. The insert (13) has an impermeable layer (16) on the side facing the iron.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Bügeleisenschuh (2) mit einer Befestigungseinrichtung (3) zum Befestigen und Lösen der Befestigung einer Bügelfläche eines elektrischen Dampfbügeleisens mit einem Sohlengrundkörper (9) mit Sohlenöffungen für den Dampfaustritt, dessen Unterseite zum Bügeln auf dem Bügelgut dient und auf dessen Oberseite eine Einlage (14,15,16) angeordnet ist, die Einlageöffnungen (17) für den Dampfdurchtritt vom Dampfbügeleisen zu den Sohlenöffnungen aufweist. Um die Gebrauchseigenschaften des Bügeleisenschuhs und insbesondere der Einlage zu verbessern wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Einlage eine Kapillarschicht (14,15) aus feuchtigkeitsabsorbierendem Material an der Oberseite des Sohlengrundkörpers zugewandten Seite und eine impermeablen Schicht (16) an der dem Dampfbügeleisen zugewandten Seite aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 75/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031655 A1 20000830; EP 1031655 B1 20040428; AT 265567 T 20040515; DE 59909329 D1 20040603; ES 2221245 T3 20041216; PL 191450 B1 20060531; PL 338534 A1 20000828; US 6539651 B1 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170210

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2221245 T3

2004-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909329 P 20040603

2004-05-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REBORDOSA, ANTONIO

2004-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POZO, REMEDIOS

2004-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CORONADO, JUAN CARLOS

2004-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VAQUEZ, MIGUEL

2004-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FALCO, DESIDERI

2004-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PEREZ, PEDRO

2004-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CUESTA, XAVIER

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRAUN GMBH

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021008

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990222

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI