Global Patent Index - EP 1031659 A2

EP 1031659 A2 2000-08-30 - Recreational surfaces

Title (en)

Recreational surfaces

Title (de)

Freizeit Bodenbelag

Title (fr)

Surface de récréation

Publication

EP 1031659 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301312 A

Priority

GB 9904073 A

Abstract (en)

There is disclosed a recreational surface (10) disposed on a sub-base (12) and comprising a mould (14) filled with a resilient composition so as to provide an impact absorbing upper surface, in which the mould (14) is configured so as to leave void areas (20) underneath the upper surface (18) which are not filled by resilient composition. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 13/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031659 A2 20000830; EP 1031659 A3 20010117; GB 2347086 A 20000830; GB 9904073 D0 19990414

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI