Global Patent Index - EP 1031659 A3

EP 1031659 A3 2001-01-17 - Recreational surfaces

Title (en)

Recreational surfaces

Title (de)

Freizeit Bodenbelag

Title (fr)

Surface de récréation

Publication

EP 1031659 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00301312 A

Priority

GB 9904073 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1031659A2] There is disclosed a recreational surface (10) disposed on a sub-base (12) and comprising a mould (14) filled with a resilient composition so as to provide an impact absorbing upper surface, in which the mould (14) is configured so as to leave void areas (20) underneath the upper surface (18) which are not filled by resilient composition. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 13/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031659 A2 20000830; EP 1031659 A3 20010117; GB 2347086 A 20000830; GB 9904073 D0 19990414

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI