Global Patent Index - EP 1031660 A1

EP 1031660 A1 2000-08-30 - Screed

Title (en)

Screed

Title (de)

Bohle

Title (fr)

Poutre lisseuse

Publication

EP 1031660 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103069 A

Priority

DE 29903338 U

Abstract (en)

The batten consists of an external base batten (G) having side plate (4) and two extendable side battens (A) each being half the width of the base batten and being displaceable in an outward direction. In the fully extended position of the side battens, the guides (S) are located on either side of the longitudinal center of the base batten in the opposite side batten.

Abstract (de)

Eine Bohle, insbesondere eine Einbau- oder Aufraubohle für einen Straßenfertiger besteht aus einer außenliegende Grundbohlenwangen (4) aufweisenden Grundbohle (G) und zwei an der Grundbohle über Antriebe (20) seitlich verfahrbaren, sich jeweils annähernd über die halbe Arbeitsbreite (bG/2) der Grundbohle erstreckenden Ausziehbohlen (A). Für jede Ausziehbohle (A) sind mehrere grundbohlenfeste Führungseinrichtungen (F1, F2, F3) vorgesehen. Mit der jeweiligen Ausziehbohle (A) ist wenigstens eine Schiebeführung (S) verbunden, die zum innenseitigen Abstützen der Ausziehbohle an einer der Führungseinrichtungen bis zur Innenseite der äußeren Grundbohlenwange (4) verfahrbar ist. In der voll eingefahrenen Stellung jeder Ausziehbohle (A) ist die Schiebeführung (S) jenseits der Längsmitte (m) der Grundbohle (G) in der gegenüberliegenden Grundbohlenhälfte (HR, HL) angeordnet, um zumindest im wesentlichen die doppelte Grund- oder Transportbreite einstellen zu können und dennoch die Ausziehbohlen bis innerhalb der Transportbreite einfahren zu können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/48 (2006.01); E01C 19/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/42 (2013.01); E01C 2301/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903338 U1 19990512; CN 1198017 C 20050420; CN 1264773 A 20000830; EP 1031660 A1 20000830; EP 1031660 B1 20040428; JP 2000309905 A 20001107; JP 3370039 B2 20030127

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-19 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Free text: CORRECTIONS ALLOWED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 28 NOVEMBER 2011 ALLOWED ON 28 APRIL 2012

2012-04-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JOSEPH VOEGELE AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: JOSEPH VOEGELE AG, 68163 MANNHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 50006201

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-04-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006201

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-04-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006201

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-03-28 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Free text: REQUEST FILED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 28 NOVEMBER 2011

2012-02-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006201

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

2011-12-30 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-06-24 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006201 P 20040603

2004-05-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUNZ, ROMAN

2000-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RESCH, ERICH

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI