Global patent index - EP 1031669 A1

EP 1031669 A1 2000-08-30 - Building frames with sigma-profile

Title (en)

Building frames with sigma-profile

Title (de)

Gebäuderahmen mit Sigma-Profilen

Title (fr)

Cadres de profilés en sigma pour bâtiments

Publication

EP 1031669 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99200494 A

Priority

EP 99200494 A

Abstract (en)

A method of making a frame is described which includes a main beam (6) and a plurality of secondary beams (8). The ends of the secondary beams (8) are connected to the main beam (6) by means of transverse tongues (10) which are intergral with and made from the same material as the main beam (6). The tongues (10) are preferably stamped out and bent either before or after the main beam profile (6) is formed. The frame is particularly suitable for making floors or intermediate platforms or ceilings in buildings. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/24; E04B 1/58; E04B 5/14; E04B 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/24 (2006.01); E04B 1/58 (2006.01); E04B 5/14 (2006.01); E04B 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/127 (2013.01); E04B 1/24 (2013.01); E04B 1/5818 (2013.01); E04B 5/14 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2415 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2448 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2454 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2457 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2472 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3532846 A1 19870326 - STROER GERHARD

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031669 A1 20000830; EP 1031669 B1 20091125; AT 449887 T 20091215; DE 69941674 D1 20100107; ES 2337638 T3 20100427

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140222

2014-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 449887

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140222

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091125

2010-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100826

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091125

2010-04-27 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2337638

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2010-03-17 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2010-01-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69941674

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2010-01-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2009-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2009-11-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2009-06-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: BUILDING FRAMES WITH SIGMA-PROFILE

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20051005

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI