Global Patent Index - EP 1031671 A3

EP 1031671 A3 2002-11-13 - Acoustic structural elements

Title (en)

Acoustic structural elements

Title (de)

Tragende Schalldämmelemente

Title (fr)

Eléments porteurs insonorisants

Publication

EP 1031671 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99305582 A

Priority

GB 9904253 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1031671A2] An acoustic structural element such as a block for use in constructing an acoustic structure such as a party wall. In preferred embodiments, the element contains at least two acoustic chambers that each communicate with the exterior of the element through at least one respective orifice positioned to be exposed in use to impinging sound. In the embodiments, the element has first and second opposed sides each of which contains at least one of said orifices. The respective chambers are tuned to resonate at substantially different frequencies of impinging sound by being of substantially different volumes, and are defined by walls that are integral with the element. The elements include integral spacer means for maintaining a cavity between the element and a cover sheet defining the cavity. The cavity communicates with the orifices of the elements. In some embodiments, end faces of the elements are shaped to fit one another in a manner that imposes a sequence upon the elements within a course, thus creating a desired mix of elements in an acoustic structure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/84; E01F 8/00; E04B 2/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/00 (2006.01); E04B 1/84 (2006.01); E04B 2/04 (2006.01); E04B 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/14 (2013.01); E01F 8/0076 (2013.01); E04B 1/8404 (2013.01); E04B 2/04 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8485 (2013.01); E04B 2001/849 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031671 A2 20000830; EP 1031671 A3 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050909

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): GB IE

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORTICRETE LIMITED

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 1/84 A, 7E 01F 8/00 B, 7E 04B 2/18 B

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI