Global patent index - EP 1031672 A2

EP 1031672 A2 2000-08-30 - Lightweight building block made of wood shavings

Title (en)

Lightweight building block made of wood shavings

Title (de)

Leichtbaustein aus Holzhackschnitzeln

Title (fr)

Bloc de construction leger réalisé à partir de copeaux de bois

Publication

EP 1031672 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102755 A

Priority

IT BZ990010 A

Abstract (en)

The building block comprises a mixture of wood chips (1) with a possibly zig-zag not very long shape produced without taking into account the fibre direction and mixed with a binder (2). which covers the entire outside surface of the individual wood chips. The wood chips are connected together by cohesion of the binder film (2) incorporating the air into the hollow interspace.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Leichtbaustein für den Hausbau welcher aus einem Gemisch von Holzhackschnitzeln (1) eventuell zackiger, nicht sehr langer Form, welche ohne Berücksichtigung der Faserrichtung hergestellt worden sind, vermengt mit einem Bindemittel (2, 4) welches die gesamte Außenfläche der einzelnen Hackschnitzel (1) bedeckt, mit oder ohne Lufteinschlüssen in den Zwischenräumen (3) zwischen den Hackschnitzeln, hergestellt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031672 A2 20000830; EP 1031672 A3 20011017; IT 1315200 B1 20030203; IT BZ990010 A1 20000823

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050209

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040415

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE IT LI SE

2002-07-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000211

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020408

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000211

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI SE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000211