Global Patent Index - EP 1031680 A1

EP 1031680 A1 2000-08-30 - Articulated paraseismic elastoplastic device for civil engineering construction and bridge with such a device

Title (en)

Articulated paraseismic elastoplastic device for civil engineering construction and bridge with such a device

Title (de)

Gelenkige paraseismische elastoplastische Vorrichtung für Hoch- und Tiefbau und Brücke mit einer derartigen Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif parasismique élastoplastique articulé pour ouvrage de génie civil, et ouvrage d'art tel qu'un pont comportant ledit dispositif

Publication

EP 1031680 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400478 A

Priority

EP 99400478 A

Abstract (en)

Longitudinal shock absorbers (13, 13') are placed between deck (1) and leg of pylon (7). Shock absorber comprises beam (14) and knuckle-jointed connecting rod (15). Beam can rotate relative to connecting rod, around axis (16), slightly perpendicular to plan T. Extreme inner beam section (17) is placed in arching template (18), firmly attached to outer lateral edge (19) of deck. An Independent claim is also included for the description of the suspension bridge.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif parasismique limitant le déplacement relatif d'une première pièce mobile (4) par rapport à une deuxième pièce mobile (7), ces deux pièces mobiles (1,7) étant reliées par des moyens de liaison, une partie (14) au moins de ces moyens de liaison étant apte à subir une déformation plastique lors du déplacement relatif des pièces mobiles (1,7) l'une par rapport à l'autre, le dispositif comprenant des moyens de guidage (18) de la déformation plastique de la partie (14) des moyens de liaison apte à se déformer plastiquement, le dispositif comprenant au moins un moyen d'articulation intermédiaire entre la partie des moyens de liaison apte à subir une déformation plastique et une des pièces mobiles (1,7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 1/00 (2006.01); E01D 11/02 (2006.01); E01D 11/04 (2006.01); E04H 9/02 (2006.01); F16F 7/12 (2006.01); F16F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 9/021 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [XD] FR 2756581 A1 19980605 - CAMPENON BERNARD SGE [FR]
  • [XDA] US 3963099 A 19760615 - SKINNER ROBERT IVAN, et al
  • [A] EP 0694652 A1 19960131 - FREYSSINET INT STUP [FR]
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 99, no. 3 31 March 1999 (1999-03-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 17, no. 244 (M - 1410) 17 May 1993 (1993-05-17)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 95, no. 1 28 February 1995 (1995-02-28)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GR IT LI MC PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031680 A1 20000830; EP 1031680 B1 20050831; AT 303489 T 20050915; DE 69926984 D1 20051006; HK 1032615 A1 20060922; JP 2000248508 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110226

2011-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110902

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110826

2011-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-09-02 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110826

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20100318

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-22 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032615

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-08-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032615

2006-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-01 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050403588

2005-12-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69926984 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GR IT LI MC PT

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050831

2004-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VINCI CONSTRUCTION GRANDS PROJETS

2004-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FREYSSINET INTERNATIONAL (STUP)

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030414

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VINCI CONSTRUCTION GRANDS PROJETS

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAMPENON BERNARD

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GR IT LI MC PT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GR IT LI MC PT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI