Global Patent Index - EP 1031681 A1

EP 1031681 A1 2000-08-30 - Environment-friendly rapid-installation sighting tower and method of assembling of the tower

Title (en)

Environment-friendly rapid-installation sighting tower and method of assembling of the tower

Title (de)

Umweltgerechter schnellmontierbarer Observationsturm und Verfahren zum Aufbau desselben

Title (fr)

Tour d'observation respectant l'environnement et à montage rapide et l'assemblage de la tour

Publication

EP 1031681 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830096 A

Priority

EP 99830096 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to sighting and observation towers with particular reference to towers for sighting forest fires. The tower consists of three essentially rectilinear beams or pillars of preimpregnated laminar wood projecting from the ground. Such beams, which can be made of one-piece or composite members with suitable shape, are provided with couplings and are arranged essentially as a pyramid provided with suitable guy ropes. They supports a raised platform provided with a cover (10) against bad weather and hot sun. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CY DE ES FR GR IT MC PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031681 A1 20000830; EP 1031681 B1 20040506; DE 69916992 D1 20040609

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130223

2012-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120905

2012-10-29 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20040402555

- Effective date: 20120905

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120229

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041006

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-04-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-23 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050223

2004-10-05 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040402555

2004-08-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-08-07 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040807

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916992 P 20040609

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CY DE ES FR GR IT MC PT

2004-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL

2004-05-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CODRA MEDITERRANEA S.R.L.

2003-09-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ENVIRONMENT-FRIENDLY RAPID-INSTALLATION SIGHTING TOWER AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING OF THE TOWER

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CY DE ES FR GR IT MC PT

2001-05-16 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010220

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010220

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CY DE ES FR GR IT MC PT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI