Global Patent Index - EP 1031683 A1

EP 1031683 A1 2000-08-30 - Vehicle door handle

Title (en)

Vehicle door handle

Title (de)

Türgriff für Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Poignée pour porte de véhicule

Publication

EP 1031683 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00103644 A

Priority

IT TO990141 A

Abstract (en)

A handle (1) for a vehicle door (2) has a connecting structure (5) fitted to the door (2); a control lever (13) hinged to the connecting structure (5) and operated, in use, by a user to control a lock on the door (2); and an aerial (23) for detecting the presence of the user about to open the door (2); the aerial (23) is housed inside the lever (13) and has an output cable (25) and an electric connector (27), which is connected to the lever (13) and to the connecting structure (5) and connects the output cable (25) to a cable (29) on the door (2) for transmitting an alert signal emitted by the aerial (23). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/06 (2013.01); E05B 81/78 (2013.01); E05B 85/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031683 A1 20000830; EP 1031683 B1 20050518; DE 60020179 D1 20050623; DE 60020179 T2 20060112; IT 1308388 B1 20011217; IT TO990141 A1 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: U-SHIN ITALIA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2009-10-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2009-04-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VALEO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-04-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH. & CO. KG.

- Effective date: 20060220

2006-02-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-01-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050829

2005-08-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60020179

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2005-05-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040211

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB SE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI