Global Patent Index - EP 1031684 A1

EP 1031684 A1 2000-08-30 - Handle for controlling a vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Handle for controlling a vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Griff zur Kontrolle eines Schlosses einer Kraftfahrzeugtür

Title (fr)

Poignée pour le contrôle d'une serrure de porte de véhicule

Publication

EP 1031684 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00103645 A

Priority

IT TO990140 A

Abstract (en)

A handle (1) for controlling a lock of a vehicle door (3) has a connecting structure (7) fitted to the door (3); a control lever (8) operated in use by a user's hand; and a control device (37) having a switching member (40) movable in a switching direction (C) to set the lock to a safety-off mode; the lever (8) has a fork (19) hinging the lever (8) to the structure (7) and connected in sliding manner inside a guide seat (11) on the structure (7) to enable the lever (8) to translate parallel to the switching direction (C) to directly activate the device (37). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/16 (2013.01); E05B 77/34 (2013.01); E05B 81/76 (2013.01); E05B 81/78 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031684 A1 20000830; EP 1031684 B1 20050629; DE 60021002 D1 20050804; DE 60021002 T2 20060518; ES 2243156 T3 20051201; IT 1308387 B1 20011217; IT TO990140 A1 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140221

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140222

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150407

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60021002

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60021002

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060330

2006-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060221

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2243156 T3

2005-09-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050929

2005-08-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021002 P 20050804

2005-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-06-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031014

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI