Global Patent Index - EP 1031692 A1

EP 1031692 A1 2000-08-30 - Closure plate for closures on windows and/or doors of buildings

Title (en)

Closure plate for closures on windows and/or doors of buildings

Title (de)

Schliessplatte für Verschlüsse an Gebäudefenstern und/oder Gebäudetüren

Title (fr)

Couvercle pour fermetures dans fenêtres et/ou portes de bâtiments

Publication

EP 1031692 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102905 A

Priority

DE 29902309 U

Abstract (en)

The closure plate (10) is at least partly in a metal closure piece (22) and in the closed state of the closure engages a closure component (8) of a closure on the pane (1) of the window or the panel of the door. The closure plate is a molded part of plastic and the closure piece is encased with plastic on the surfaces of the closure plate visible after installation on the arch frame (2). The closure piece is produced by stamping and/or bending out of metal plate. At least one bolt opening is formed by at least one slot-shaped recess, which is open at least to the upper side of the closure plate turned away from the rabbet.

Abstract (de)

Eine Schließplatte für Verschlüsse an Gebäudefenstern und/oder Gebäudetüren weist wenigstens eine Riegelöffnung (11) auf, die zumindest teilweise in einem Schließstück (12) der Schließplatte (10) gebildet ist und in die im Schließzustand des Verschlusses wenigstens ein Verschlußelement (2) des jeweiligen Verschlusses eingreift. Die Schließplatte (10) ist ein Formteil aus Kunststoff. Das Schließstück (22) ist zumindest an den nach der Montage sichtbaren Flächen der Schließplatte (10) vom Kunststoff umhüllt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/1808 (2013.01); E05B 15/1635 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902309 U1 19990722; AT 237730 T 20030515; EP 1031692 A1 20000830; EP 1031692 B1 20030416; TR 200000502 A2 20001023; TR 200000502 A3 20001023

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100212

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100212

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-09-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GRETSCH-UNITAS G.M.B.H. BAUBESCHLAGE

- Effective date: 20100228

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090408

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-02-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: GRETSCH-UNITAS GMBH

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001755 P 20030522

2003-05-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GRETSCH-UNITAS GMBHBAUBESCHLAEGE

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR IT NL

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI