Global Patent Index - EP 1031697 A1

EP 1031697 A1 2000-08-30 - Hydraulically actuated cover unit

Title (en)

Hydraulically actuated cover unit

Title (de)

Hydraulisch betätigbare Abdeckeinheit

Title (fr)

Unité d'obturation à commande hydraulique

Publication

EP 1031697 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00200603 A

Priority

NL 1011362 A

Abstract (en)

The hydraulic operating device comprises a double-acting hydraulic actuator for moving the cover element such as a boot lid . The actuator has a bypass channel extending between a first mouth (42) formed in the housing and connecting with the cylinder chamber (32), and a second mouth (46). The first mouth is arranged so that in the initial part of the closing movement the closing chamber only connects with its associated connection and is closed by the first mouth . In the second part the closing chamber connects with both the associated connection and with the first mouth of the first bypass channel and the second mouth is set up so that hydraulic fluid supplied to the connection of the closing chamber can flow completely or in part out from the closing chamber along the first bypass channel.

Abstract (de)

Abdeckeinheit, umfassend einen Körper mit in diesem einer Öffnung, sowie ein Abdeckelelement, das über Gelenkmittel gelenkig an dem Körper befestigt ist und zwischen einem geschlossenen Stand und einem geöffneten Stand beweglich ist. Die Abdeckeinheit umfaßt einen doppeltwirkenden Aktuator für das Abdeckelement. Die Schließbewegung des Abdeckelements umfaßt, aus dem geöffneten Stand gesehen, einen ersten Winkelbereich und einen an diesen anschließenden zweiten Winkelbereich, wobei in dem zweiten Winkelbereich die von dem Aktuator lieferbare Kraft geringer als in dem ersten Winkelbereich ist. Der Aktuator ist mit einem ersten Bypass-Kanal versehen, der sich zwischen einem in dem Aktuatorgehäuse gebildeten und an den Zylinderraum anschließenden ersten Mund und einem zweiten Mund erstreckt, wobei der erste Mund in solcher Weise aufgestellt ist, daß in dem ersten Winkelbereich der Schließbewegung die Schließkammer nur in Verbindung mit dem zugehörigen Anschluß steht und von dem ersten Mund des ersten Bypass-Kanals abgeschlossen ist. In dem zweiten Winkelbereich ist die Schließkammer sowohl mit dem zugehörigen Anschluß, als auch mit dem ersten Mund des ersten Bypass-Kanals verbunden, wobei der zweite Mund in solcher Weise aufgestellt ist, daß dem Anschluß der Schließkammer zugeführte hydraulische Flüssigkeit gänzlich oder teilweise entlang dem ersten Bypass-Kanalaus der Schließkammer ausströmen kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/04; E05F 15/00; F15B 15/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/00 (2006.01); E05F 15/04 (2006.01); F15B 15/22 (2006.01); E05F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/224 (2013.01); E05F 15/49 (2013.01); E05F 15/50 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/50 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/548 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20561 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031697 A1 20000830; EP 1031697 B1 20040714; AT 271181 T 20040715; DE 50007032 D1 20040819; NL 1011362 C2 20000825

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150221

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150222

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-09-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007032

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140226

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041214

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ACTUANT CORP.

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ACTUANT CORP.

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050221

2005-02-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050221

2005-02-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050221

2005-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040714

2005-01-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-10-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041025

2004-10-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-10-14 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007032 P 20040819

2004-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030704

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACTUANT CORPORATION

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI