Global patent index - EP 1031699 A1

EP 1031699 A1 2000-08-30 - Method of securing windows and the mass for the use in this method

Title (en)

Method of securing windows and the mass for the use in this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Sicherung von Gebäudeverglasungen und Masse zur Verwendung im Verfahren

Title (fr)

Méthode pour assurer la rétention de fenêtres en cas de rupture et la matière pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 1031699 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99103617 A

Priority

EP 99103617 A

Abstract (en)

A substance in the form of a single or multi component system is applied in one or more layers as a paint or spray film and is designed to dry out or harden to form a cohesive resilient layer on the glass. It can be removed free of residue. The coating is applied to the side of the glazing facing the inside of the building. The substance can contain softeners and/or solvents to adjust the elasticity and adhesive capacity of the layer.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Sicherung von Gebäudeverglasungen, insbesondere gegen Sturmwinde und auftreffende Gegenstände, in welchem eine im Verfahren zu verwendende aushärtende oder abtrocknende streich- und/oder sprühfähige Masse, die als Anstrich oder Sprühfilm unter Ausbildung einer zusammenhängenden elastischen Schicht auf dem Glas haftet und rückstandsfrei entfernbar ist, auf der dem Gebäudeinneren zugewandten Seite der Verglasung aufgetragen wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/12 (2006.01); E06B 7/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/12 (2013.01); E06B 7/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1031699 A1 20000830

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040310

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010206

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI